Scott, Tracy Ann (CPSO#: 59549)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jun 2008


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 25 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 2008