Scott-Thomas, Nancy Lynn (CPSO#: 64995)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993


Former Name: Ellis, Nancy Lynn (used until: 14 Oct 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 680-1065
Fax: (613) 695-1870
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nancy Scott-Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2011

Dr. N. Scott-Thomas ( CPSO# 64995 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 680-1065


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. NANCY LYNN SCOTT-THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT-THOMAS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993