Scriven, Edward Alexander Kenneth (CPSO#: 86367)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
450 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 8T2
Phone: (905) 864-9921
Fax: (905) 864-8003
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scriven Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Scriven ( CPSO# 86367 )

Business Address:
104 - 450 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 8T2
Phone Number: (905) 864-9921

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD ALEXANDER KENNETH SCRIVEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCRIVEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012