Scrivens, Blair Alexander (CPSO#: 60877)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sandbanks Medical Centre
12 Prince Edward Drive
Wellington ON  K0K 3L0
Phone: (613) 399-1281
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite Six
35 Bridge Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Canada
Phone: (613) 476-6661
County: County of Prince Edward
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BLAIR ALEXANDER SCRIVENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCRIVENS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Oct 1991
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1990