Scroggie, David Gordon (CPSO#: 21126)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jan 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
18 Cornish Road
Toronto ON  M4T 2E2
Phone: (416) 923-6712
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID GORDON SCROGGIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCROGGIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Oct 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1976