Scuccimarri, Rosie (CPSO#: 73256)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Feb 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Feb 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1999 to 31 Mar 1999
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 17 Jan 2000 to 25 Feb 2000
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Feb 2000