Scullion, Catherine Mary (CPSO#: 59650)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Lao Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 02 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Scullion ( CPSO# 59650 )
Dr. V. Lao ( CPSO# 59794 )

Business Address:
47 Sheppard Avenue East
5th Floor
Toronto ON  M2N 7E7
Phone Number: (416) 212-6259

Business Address:
28 Langstaff Road East
Thornhill ON  L3T 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 709-9955

Business Address:
1261 B Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L4
Phone Number: (416) 490-0499

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARY SCULLION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCULLION is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1989