Scully, Karen Elizabeth (CPSO#: 32049)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - North Carolina

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Sep 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017