Scully, Linda Jane (CPSO#: 32779)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Civic Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4830
Fax: (613) 761-5415
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 08 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA JANE SCULLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCULLY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1981