Scully, Mary Frances (CPSO#: 56077)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Oct 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Oct 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Italian

Education:University of Dublin, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Oct 1996