Seah, Jo-An (CPSO#: 99817)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Melbourne, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2013 to 13 Mar 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 14 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013