Seah, Stanley Kin Kok (CPSO#: 18528)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Feb 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Nov 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R
Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Sep 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1995
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 01 Jan 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 01 Jan 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from February 1, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Stanley Kin Kok Seah,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Seah to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Seah has ceased to practise medicine in Ontario, effective January 1,
                  2016.