Seal, Melanie Dawn (CPSO#: 82400)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: Pike, Melanie Dawn (used until: 13 Aug 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 30 May 2005 to 24 Jun 2005
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 25 Jun 2005 to 29 Jul 2005
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 03 Jan 2006 to 03 Feb 2006
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008