Seale, Edward Randall (CPSO#: 65537)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph Family Medicine Clinic
2555 St Joseph Boulevard
Suite 100
Orleans ON  K1C 1S6
Phone: (613) 830-1298
Fax: (613) 830-2170
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
general campus
501 Smyth Rd.
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 722-7000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Seale Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Seale ( CPSO# 65537 )

Business Address:
100 - 2555 St Joseph Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1C 1S6
Phone Number: (613) 830-1218

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD RANDALL SEALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEALE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993