Searle, Howard Gordon (CPSO#: 19459)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Oct 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2006