Searles, Gordon Edward (CPSO#: 57008)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 1997