Sears, James Nicholas (CPSO#: 59651)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 01 Dec 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Nov 1992
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 01 Dec 1992

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 01 Dec 1992
Summary:

 In December 1992, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Sears guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a 
 patient, contrary to s. 27(29); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
 members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32).  Consequently, the 
 Committee ordered that Dr. Sears' licence to practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 25 Feb 1994
Hearing Date(s): 30 Nov 1992