Sears, Malcolm Raymond (CPSO#: 56642)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Dec 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
Firestone Institute for Respiratory
Health
50 Charlton Avenue East -T3219
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33286
Fax: (905) 521-6132
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 24 Apr 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALCOLM RAYMOND SEARS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEARS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 May 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1998