Sears, Steven Thomas (CPSO#: 72337)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
18 Silver Street
Box 399
Cobalt ON  P0J 1C0
Phone: (705) 679-5466
Fax: (705) 679-5588
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Temiskaming Hospital
P O Box 4040
421 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard ON  P0J 1P0
Canada
Phone: (705) 647-8121
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Sears Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sears ( CPSO# 72337 )

Business Address:
18 Silver Street
PO box 399
Cobalt ON  P0J 1C0
Phone Number: (705) 679-5466

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN THOMAS SEARS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEARS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2000