Seaton, Trevor Leroy (CPSO#: 27810)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Sep 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2125 Wyecroft Road
Suite 4
Oakville ON  L6L 5L7
Phone: (905) 465-9229
Fax: (905) 465-3883
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Trevor Seaton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Seaton ( CPSO# 27810 )

Business Address:
Suite 4
2125 Wyecroft Road
Oakville ON  L6L 5L7
Phone Number: (905) 465-9229

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: (647) 933 2904
Date Received: 25 Jul 2014

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Grand Cayman
Jamaica

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Mar 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TREVOR LEROY SEATON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEATON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1975