Seaward, Percival Gareth Rudee (CPSO#: 66322)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 May 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 May 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Maternal Fetal Medicine
OPG Suite 3-907
700 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z6
Phone: (416) 586-8660
Fax: (416) 586-8617
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Gareth R. Seaward Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Seaward ( CPSO# 66322 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Maternal Fetal Medicine
700 University Avenue
OPG Suite 3-907
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z6
Phone Number: (416) 586-8660

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PERCIVAL GARETH RUDEE SEAWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEAWARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1993