Sebastien, Theodore Stewart (CPSO#: 61260)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Oct 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Reston Hospital Medical Plaza
Suite 415
1800 Town Center Drive
Reston VA  20190
United States
Phone: (703) 709-1492
Fax: (703) 709-5111

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Virginia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 08 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THEODORE STEWART SEBASTIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEBASTIEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1990