Sebestian, Magda (CPSO#: 23931)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 18 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, German, Hungarian

Education:University of Comenius, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999