Seccareccia, Dori-Lynn Marie (CPSO#: 58186)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: Yukich, Dori-Lynn Marie (used until: 29 Jun 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 4624
Fax: (416) 480-5144
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Seccareccia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Seccareccia ( CPSO# 58186 )
Dr. R. Gerace ( CPSO# 25637 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Oct 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DORI-LYNN MARIE SECCARECCIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SECCARECCIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 02 Jan 1990 to 28 Feb 1990
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1988