Sedarat, Franklin (CPSO#: 87409)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 25 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Tehran, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2004 to 31 Oct 2004
Research Fellows - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2007