Sediq, Aimal (CPSO#: 76542)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 10
27 Ruth Ave.
Brampton ON  L6Z-4R2
Phone: (905) 495-5888
Fax: (905) 495-5822
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1605 Main St. West
Hamilton ON  L8S-1E6
Canada
Phone: 905 527 2991
Fax: 905 529 1222
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aimal Sediq Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sediq ( CPSO# 76542 )

Business Address:
1605 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1E6
Phone Number: (905) 574-4911

Business Address:
Unit 10
27 Ruth Avenue
Brampton ON  L6Z 4R2
Phone Number: (905) 495-5888

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AIMAL SEDIQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEDIQ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003