Sedykh, Olena (CPSO#: 105025)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 May 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLENA SEDYKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEDYKH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2014 to 13 Jan 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 20 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2017