See, Hilario (CPSO#: 70970)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Aug 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
2175 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1W8
Phone: (416) 492-7700
Fax: (416) 492-5776
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 26 Jan 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 27 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 12 Aug 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 12 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 12, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Hilario See, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. See to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                          DR.  HILARIO SEE
                                          ("Dr. See")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. See, certificate of registration number 70970, am a member of the
                  College.  The College has received information regarding my standard of
                  practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. See, acknowledge that the College initiated investigations bearing
                  File Numbers 94610 and 7214927 (the "Investigations") into whether I
                  engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my family
                  practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   Resignation of Prescribing Privileges   

                  (a)   I, Dr. See, acknowledge that I have executed the Prescribing
                        Resignation Letter to Health Canada, which is attached hereto as
                        Schedule "A" (the "Resignation Letter").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. See, consent to the College sending the Resignation Letter
                        to Health Canada on my behalf.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. See, undertake and agree that I will not issue new
                        prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the
                        following substances:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                              Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27); 
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19); 
                  
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Schedule "B"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Schedule "C")
                  
                        (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
                              Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in
                              Schedule "D");                       
                  
                        and as amended from time to time.
                  
            (5)   I, Dr. See, undertake that I will return any supplies of the substances
                  referred to in section (4)(c) above that are presently in my possession,
                  in any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and secure manner, as stipulated in
                  the College's Policy Number 8-12, "Prescribing Drugs."

            (6)   I, Dr. See, undertake to inform the College of each and every location
                  that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to,
                  hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively
                  my "Practice Location(s)"), within fifteen (15) days of executing this
                  Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of
                  any and all new Practice Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing
                  practice at that location.

            (7)   Posting a Sign 

                  (a)   I, Dr. See, undertake that I shall post a sign in the waiting
                        room(s) of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and
                        secure location, in the form set out at Schedule "E".  For further
                        clarity, this sign shall state as follows: 
                  
                                    IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                        Dr. See must not prescribe any of the following: 
                  
                        -     Narcotic Drugs
                        -     Narcotic Preparations
                        -     Controlled Drugs
                        -     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                        -     All other Monitored Drugs
                  
                        Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and
                        Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. See, undertake to post a certified translation in any
                        language in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (7)(a) above, in the waiting room(s) of all my Practice
                        Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form
                        set out at Schedule "E". 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. See, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (7)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. See, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this
                        Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I will
                        notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. See, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (7)(c) prior to beginning to
                        provide services in the language(s) described in section (7)(d).
                  
            (8)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. See, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. See, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Schedule "F", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Schedule
                              "G";
                  
                        (ii)  Review materials and have an initial meeting to discuss
                              practice improvement recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me at least once every other week ("Moderate Level
                              Supervision").  If, after a minimum of three (3) months of
                              Moderate Level Supervision, the Clinical Supervisor
                              recommends it and the College approves, Clinical Supervision
                              will be reduced such that the Clinical Supervisor will meet
                              with me at least once every month ("Low Level Supervision");
                  
                        (iv)  Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. See, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected
                        by the Clinical Supervisor(s), independent of my participation,
                        based on the educational needs identified in the IEP set out at
                        Schedule "G" to my Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern
                        identified in the reports of the medical inspectors dated March 18,
                        2015, April 10, 2015, April 15, 2015, February 12, 2016 and May 16,
                        2016 ("the Medical Inspectors' Reports"), and concerns that may
                        arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. See, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Schedule "F" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. See, undertake to ensure that Schedule "F" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within ten (10)
                        days of the date the ICR Committee approves this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. See, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking
                        in Schedule "F" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to
                        continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20)
                        days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in
                        the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable
                        to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College
                        within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. See, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (8)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. See, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (8)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (9)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. See, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        the following professional education:
                  
                        (i)   all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Schedule
                              "G"; and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. See, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out in
                        section (9)(a) within one (1) month of completing it.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. See, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to
                        the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        professional education set out in section (9)(a).
                  
            (10)  Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. See, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                        completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (8) above
                        and Schedule "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of my
                        practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected
                        by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and agree that
                        the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of
                        my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. See, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking , and to abide by
                        those recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the
                        ICR Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. See, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. See, understand and agree that if I am of the view that any
                        of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have
                        thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within
                        which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR Committee
                        will consider my submissions and make a determination regarding
                        whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable
                        and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. See, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (10)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. See, hereby consent to any of the following being included
                        on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
                        (ii)  any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (10)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. See, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. See, acknowledge and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it. 

            (13)  I, Dr. See, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the
                  Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. See, acknowledge and agree that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (15)  I, Dr. See, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (16)  I, Dr. See, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the
                  public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (17)  I, Dr. See, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. See was the subject of a College investigation into whether he
                        engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his
                        prescribing, family practice. As a result of the investigation: 
                  
                        Dr. See will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor
                        acceptable to the College for 12 months. 
                  
                        Dr. See's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by
                        the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
                        Dr. See must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing
                        prescriptions for any of the following substances:
                  
                        (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                              under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.
                              19);
                        (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19);
                        (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug
                              Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c.
                              F-27); 
                        (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                              Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations
                              made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C.,
                              1996, c. 19); 
                        (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics
                              Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);        
                  
                        and as amended from time to time.
                  
                        Dr. See must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of
                        all his Practice Locations, which states as follows: 
                  
                                          IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                                    Dr. See must not prescribe any of the following: 
                  
                                    -     Narcotic Drugs
                                    -     Narcotic Preparations
                                    -     Controlled Drugs
                                    -     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                                    -     All other Monitored Drugs
                  
                        Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and
                        Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (18)  I, Dr. See, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not interfere
                  with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and patient
                  charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems
                  necessary in order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. See, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS, and any person who or institution
                  that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor
                  my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. See, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent
                  forms, attached hereto as Schedule "H" and Schedule "I", respectively.

            (21)  I, Dr. See, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section (9) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (22)  I, Dr. See, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (23)  I, Dr. See, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates my
                  completion of the professional education set out in section (9) above,
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Schedule "F";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section (9) above and which he or
                        she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 12, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Hilario See to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 12, 2016:

Dr. See was the subject of a College investigation into whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his prescribing, family practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. See will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.

Dr. See’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

Dr. See must not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);

(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);

and as amended from time to time.

Dr. See must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all his Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. See must not prescribe any of the following:
- Narcotic Drugs
- Narcotic Preparations
- Controlled Drugs
- Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
- All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca