Seelisch, Jennifer Lynn (CPSO#: 93677)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Hematology
and Oncology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LYNN SEELISCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEELISCH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2016