Seely, Andrew John Ervine (CPSO#: 76659)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Thoracic Surgery
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road, Box 708
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8845
Fax: (613) 737-8668
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AJE Seely Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Seely ( CPSO# 76659 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
Thoracic Surgery & Critical Care Medicine
Box 708
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8845

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW JOHN ERVINE SEELY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEELY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 8 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2004