Sefin, Ashraf Akromen Morcos (CPSO#: 99498)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone: (519) 623-4200
Fax: (519) 623-2546
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

820 main street East
Milton ON  L9T0J4
Canada
Phone: 9058649898
Fax: 9058649393
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

71 Rebecca street
Hamilton ON  L8R1J1
Canada
Phone: 9055223233
Fax: 9055223433
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ashraf Sefin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sefin ( CPSO# 99498 )

Business Address:
Grandview Medical Centre
Family Health Team
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 623-4200

Business Address:
820 Main Street East
Milton ON  L9T 0J4
Phone Number: (905) 864-9898

Business Address:
Hamilton Urban Community Care
71 Rebecca Street
Hamilton ON  L8R 1J1
Phone Number: (905) 522-3233

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHRAF AKROMEN MORCOS SEFIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEFIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 22 Oct 2012 to 13 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 14 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 21 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 19 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2014