Segal, Michael David (CPSO#: 66849)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 24 Aug 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Aug 1997
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1997