Segal, Phillip Harry Bacal (CPSO#: 80945)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Room 12 E N 216
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5329
Fax: (416) 340-3314
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Polyclinic Family and Specialty Med
2 Champagne Drive, Unit B17
Toronto ON  M3J2C5
Canada
Phone: 416-222-6160 Ext. 269
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Phillip Segal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Segal ( CPSO# 80945 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Room 12 E N 216
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-5329

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Room 413
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILLIP HARRY BACAL SEGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEGAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008