Segal, Shimon (CPSO#: 61916)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1994