Segal, Steven Howard (CPSO#: 71168)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

235 Eagle Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 1J8
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

4-490 Harry Walker Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 898-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G & S Segal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Segal ( CPSO# 71114 )
Dr. S. Segal ( CPSO# 71168 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
1 - 390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X6
Phone Number: (905) 881-2422

Business Address:
490 Harry Walker Drive
Unit 4
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8C3
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Suite 201
235 Eagle Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 1S8
Phone Number: (905) 853-3727

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN HOWARD SEGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEGAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002