Segedi, Maja (CPSO#: 87823)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian, Slovak

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 18 Oct 2007 to 30 Oct 2007
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015