Seguin, Daniel Rejean (CPSO#: 65622)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clarence Rockland Family
Health Team
2741 Chamberland Street
Rockland ON  K4K 1B4
Phone: (613) 446-7677
Fax: (613) 446-5737
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Seguin Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Seguin ( CPSO# 65622 )

Business Address:
Clarence Rockland Family
Health Team
2741 Chamberland Street
Rockland ON  K4K 1B4
Phone Number: (613) 446-7677

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL REJEAN SEGUIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEGUIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 29 Jun 1992 to 28 Jun 1993
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2002