Seguin, Herve Leopold (CPSO#: 15366)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 03 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Nov 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000