Seguin, John Edward (CPSO#: 21972)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Canadian Grads (No MCC) Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 2000