Seguin, John Philip (CPSO#: 71142)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
506 Astorville Road
Astorville ON  P0H 1B0
Phone: (705) 752-5521
Fax: (705) 752-2193
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

8 King Street North
Powassan ON  P0H 1Z0
Canada
County: Territorial District of Parry Sound
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Seguin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Seguin ( CPSO# 71142 )

Business Address:
506 Astorville Road
Astorville ON  P0H 1B0
Phone Number: (705) 752-5521

Business Address:
8 King Street North
Powassan ON  P0H 1Z0
Phone Number: (705) 724-1020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN PHILIP SEGUIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEGUIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999