Seguin, Joseph Jacques Yvon (CPSO#: 46626)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1986 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Apr 2004