Segura, Jose (CPSO#: 59224)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 31 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017