Sehdev, Sandeep Raj (CPSO#: 57055)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70179
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Sehdev Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sehdev ( CPSO# 57055 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 05 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDEEP RAJ SEHDEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEHDEV is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1992