Sehgal, Yogi (CPSO#: 70010)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: High Allen Clinic P O Box 489 79 5th Avenue North Sioux Lookout ON P8T 1A8
Date Received: 23 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015