Sehl, John Joseph (CPSO#: 60914)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Centre
Suite 310
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 571-7496
Fax: (519) 954-3489
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Sehl Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sehl ( CPSO# 60914 )

Business Address:
Suite 310
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 571-7989

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN JOSEPH SEHL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEHL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1990