Seibel, Deborah Anne (CPSO#: 29442)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Apr 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Apr 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Apr 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Apr 2006