Seid, Cherinet Mohammed (CPSO#: 83986)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English, Other

Education:Addis Ababa University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3201 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON  K2J 4H9
Phone: (613) 825 1636
Fax: (613) 825 5521
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cherinet Seid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Seid ( CPSO# 83986 )

Business Address:
North Renfrew Family Health Team
117 Banting Drive
Deep River ON  K0J 1P0
Phone Number: (613) 584-1037

Business Address:
20260 County Road 43
Alexandria ON  K0C 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 525-2222

Business Address:
3201 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON  K2J 4H9
Phone Number: (613) 825-1636

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jan 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHERINET MOHAMMED SEID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2006 to 05 Apr 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 06 Apr 2006 to 16 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2007 to 14 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2008 to 16 Jan 2009
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2008