Seidelin, Peter Harald (CPSO#: 67565)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Mar 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Mar 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
EN-6 234A
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4930
Fax: (416) 340-3865
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

UHN Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5184
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter H. Seidelin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Seidelin ( CPSO# 67565 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Room EN6-234A
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4930

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital-Cath Lab
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5184

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER HARALD SEIDELIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SEIDELIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1993 to 31 Oct 1994
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Feb 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Feb 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Mar 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 1996