Seidelman, William Edward (CPSO#: 22141)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1969
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Jul 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 2002