Seidman, Jeffrey Milton (CPSO#: 51610)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 27 Nov 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Nov 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1985
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 28 Oct 2002
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 13 Feb 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2003
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 24 Apr 2003
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 28 Apr 2003
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2003
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 13 May 2003
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 27 Nov 2003

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 Oct 2002
Summary:

On October 28, 2002, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Seidman s plea of guilty and found 
that he had committed professional misconduct for sexually abusing a patient, sexual impropriety 
with a patient and engaging in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having 
regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
The Discipline Committee suspended Dr. Seidman s certificate of registration until the dispostion 
of the penalty.  A penalty hearing was held on December 2, 2002.  The Discipline Committee 
reserved its decision on penalty. 
 
On February 13, 2003, the Discipline Committee ordered the following penalty: 
 
1)    The Registrar revoke Dr. Seidman s certificate of registration effective immediately; 
2)    Dr. Seidman appear before this panel to be reprimanded and that the fact of the reprimand 
      be recorded on the register; and 
3)    The results of the proceedings be recorded on the register. 
 
In addition the Discipline Committee ordered Dr. Seidman to pay $12,500.00 in costs. 
 
Dr. Seidman appealed to the Divisional Court.  Pursuant to subsection 25(1) of the Statutory 
Powers and Procedures Act, the decision of the Discipline Committee does not take effect 
pending the outcome of the appeal. 
 
On April 24, 2003, the College brought a motion before the Discipline Committee to lift the stay 
of the decision.  The Discipline Committee granted Dr. Seidman s request for adjournment of 
the motion until May 8, 2003 on the condition that he be immediately suspended until such time 
that terms, conditions and limitations on his certificate of registration are put into effect.   The 
conditions are to apply until the completion of the hearing of the motion. 
 
On May 8, 2003 the Discipline Committee heard the motion to lift the stay of the decision.  The 
Committee did not lift the stay of revocation entirely, however, imposed terms and conditions on 
Dr. Seidman s certificate of registration. 
 
On November 27, 2003, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Seidman s appeal, therefore, the 
decision of the Discipline Committee is in effect. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 27 Nov 2003
Hearing Date(s): Oct 28, 2002

Application for Reinstatement   Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
Decision Date: 11 Sep 2013
Decision: Application Denied